EP0884180 - Process for controlling or regulating operations carried out by a printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2005 | Revocation of patent | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kipphan, Helmut, Prof.Dr. Bibiena-Strasse 6 68723 Schwetzingen / DE | 02 /
Geissler, Wolfgang Gartenstrasse 34a 76669 Bad Schönborn / DE | 03 /
Fischer, Gerhard, Dr. Höhenstrasse 18 74889 Sinsheim / DE | 04 /
Huber, Werner, Dr. Dambach-la-Ville-Strasse 2D 69231 Rauenberg / DE | 05 /
Kistler, Bernd Kaltenbergstrasse 46 75031 Eppingen / DE | 06 /
Löffler, Gerhard Clara-Gerlach-Weg 2 37115 Duderstadt / DE | 07 /
Rodi, Anton Karlsruher-Strasse 12 69181 Leimen / DE | 08 /
Bucher, Harald Finkenweg 5 74927 Eschelbronn / DE | 09 /
Rensch, Clemens, Dr. Ladenburger-Strasse 93 69120 Heidelberg / DE | [1998/51] | Application number, filing date | 98106543.6 | 27.06.1994 | [1998/51] | Priority number, date | DE19934321179 | 25.06.1993 Original published format: DE 4321179 | [1998/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0884180 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0884180 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B41F33/00 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
B41F33/0045 (EP,US);
B41F33/0036 (EP,US);
B41M1/14 (EP,US);
B41P2233/51 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1998/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung oder Regung von Betriebsvorgängen einer drucktechnischen Maschine | [1998/51] | English: | Process for controlling or regulating operations carried out by a printing machine | [1998/51] | French: | Procédé de commande ou de regulation des operations effectuées par une machine d'impression | [1998/51] | Examination procedure | 09.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/51] | 26.06.1998 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 02.11.1998 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request accepted | 10.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 22.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94921626.1 / EP0705171 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.10.2003
ADMISSIBLE KBA Koenig & Bauer AG Postfach 02 01 64 01439 Radebeul / DE Opponent's representative Simon, Franz Koenig & Bauer AG Planeta-Bogenoffset Radebeul Friedrich-List-Strasse 47/49 01445 Radebeul / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.10.2003
ADMISSIBLE KBA Koenig & Bauer AG Postfach 02 01 64 01439 Radebeul / DE Opponent's representative Simon, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. Koenig & Bauer AG, Planeta-Bogenoffset Radebeul, Friedrich-List-Strasse 47/49 01445 Radebeul / DE | 05.12.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.04.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 24.06.2005 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/49] | Request for further processing for: | 22.07.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 22.07.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.11.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 27.06.2004 | FR | 28.02.2005 | [2005/46] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8901867 (VALTION TEKNILLINEN [FI]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0436818 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 5 - column 2, line 21 *; | [T]EP0649743 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [T] * page 7, line 2 - page 7, line 18 * | Examination | EP0444427 | DE4103574 |