EP0949770 - Bidirectional broadcasting system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2001 [2001/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BetaResearch Gesellschaft für Entwicklung und Vermarktung digitaler Infrastrukturen mbH Betastrasse 1 85774 Unterföhring / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states BetaResearch Gesellschaft für Entwicklung und Vermarktung digitaler Infrastrukturen mbH Betastrasse 1 85774 Unterföhring / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heichler, Johannes c/o BetaResearch Betastrasse 1 85774 Unterföhring / DE | 02 /
Gillies, David c/o BetaResearch Betastrasse 1 85774 Unterföhring / DE | 03 /
Henselmann-Weiss, Wolfgang c/o BetaResearch Betastrasse 1 85774 Unterföhring / DE | 04 /
Kempf, Andreas c/o BetaResearch Betastrasse 1 85774 Unterföhring / DE | 05 /
Toth, Gabor c/o BetaResearch Betastrasse 1 85774 Unterföhring / DE | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98106597.2 | 09.04.1998 | [1999/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0949770 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/00, H04H9/00, H04N7/173 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
H04H20/28 (EP);
H04H20/38 (EP);
H04H40/90 (EP);
H04N7/173 (EP);
H04H20/06 (EP);
H04H20/63 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/26] |
Former [1999/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zweirichtungsrundfunksystem | [1999/41] | English: | Bidirectional broadcasting system | [1999/41] | French: | Système de radiodiffusion bidirectionnel | [1999/41] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/35] | 08.03.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.06.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0713347 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 7 * * column 14, line 11 - column 52 * * claim 1 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 2,3; | [A]WO9721276 (STANFORD TELECOMM INC [US]) [A] 1,5,7 * abstract * * claim 1 * * page 9, line 3 - page 10, line 8 * * page 37, line 19 - page 40, line 28 * * figures 1,17-21 *; | [XA]WO9748196 (BELLSOUTH CORP [US]) [X] 12,14 * abstract * * page 8, line 24 - line 27 * * page 11, line 9 - line 16 * * page 12, line 2 - line 9 * * claims 1,6 * * figures 1,3-5 * [A] 1,7,11; | [A]WO9748191 (BROADBAND NETWORKS INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-3,7,11,12 * abstract * * page 20, line 20 - line 35 * * claim 33 * * figures 1-3,6 *; | [A]EP0825775 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 12,13 * abstract ** column 3, line 32 - line 48 *; | [E]EP0851618 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [E] 1,7,9,10,12 * abstract * * column 5, line 42 - line 55 * * column 6, line 11 - line 14 * * column 7, line 34 - column 47 * * claims 7,9 * * figures 3-6 * |