EP0875416 - Tiltable backrest for rear seats of automotive vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft 80788 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ippendorf, Günter Grillparzerstrasse 53 81675 München / DE | 02 /
Stubenberger, Andreas Carl-Orff-Bogen 105 80939 München / DE | 03 /
Tietje, Peter Sandweg 4 85777 Fahrenzhausen / DE | 04 /
Moser, Erhard Mattighofer Strasse 5 80939 München / DE | 05 /
Tobisch, Franz Untere Grasstrasse 24 81541 München / DE | 06 /
Walsdorf, Christian Nadistrasse 8 80809 München / DE | [1998/45] | Application number, filing date | 98106839.8 | 15.04.1998 | [1998/45] | Priority number, date | DE1997118067 | 29.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19718067 | [1998/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0875416 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0875416 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/36, B60N2/44 | [1999/32] | CPC: |
B60N2/686 (EP);
B60N2/23 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/45] | B60N2/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/16] |
Former [1998/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kippbare Rückenlehne für einen Rücksitz eines Kraftfahrzeuges | [1998/45] | English: | Tiltable backrest for rear seats of automotive vehicles | [1998/45] | French: | Dossier rabattable pour siège arrière d'un véhicule automobile | [1998/45] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 08.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/02] | 10.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE9419177U (FAHRZEUGSITZE BAD SCHANDAU GMB [DE]) [Y] 1-7,9,10 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]DE3046427 (KEIPER RECARO GMBH CO [DE]) [Y] 1-7,9,10 * page 7, line 21 - page 10, line 6; figures 1-8; claims 1-17 *; | [A]EP0372339 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,8 * abstract *; | [AD]EP0330594 (SABLE SA [FR]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE3322511 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [A] 1,11 * column A; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE4410713 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-5,8-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0751036 (CESA [FR]) [A] 1-3,8-10 * column 3, line 12 - line 34; figure 1 * | by applicant | EP0330594 |