EP0872723 - Optical sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.2000 [2000/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENDRESS + HAUSER CONDUCTA GESELLSCHAFT FÜR MESS UND REGELTECHNIK mbH & Co. Dieselstrasse 24 70839 Gerlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | For all designated states ENDRESS + HAUSER CONDUCTA GESELLSCHAFT FÜR MESS UND REGELTECHNIK mbH & Co. Dieselstrasse 24 70839 Gerlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schrettenbrunner, M.B., Dr. Stöcklestrasse 4 72070 Tübingen / DE | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1998/43] | Friz, Oliver Patentanwälte, Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 98107142.6 | 20.04.1998 | [1998/43] | Priority number, date | DE1997116252 | 18.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19716252 | [1998/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0872723 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0872723 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | [1999/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/01, C03C27/04 | [1999/15] | CPC: |
C04B37/025 (EP);
G01N21/01 (EP);
G01N21/53 (EP);
G01N21/8507 (EP);
C04B2237/10 (EP);
C04B2237/343 (EP);
C04B2237/406 (EP);
C04B2237/64 (EP);
C04B2237/76 (EP);
C04B2237/84 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/43] | G01N21/01 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1999/52] |
Former [1998/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optischer Sensor | [1998/43] | English: | Optical sensor | [1998/43] | French: | Capteur optique | [1998/43] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/27] | 10.02.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.11.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.11.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.11.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.11.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.11.1999 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.11.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.11.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.11.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.11.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.11.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 30.11.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.11.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.11.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.11.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.11.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.11.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.11.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.11.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.11.1999 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2163475 (JENAER GLASWERK SCHOTT & GEN) [Y] 1,4 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [Y]US4395632 (ROESS RUDI ET AL) [Y] 1,4 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 17 * * figure - *; | [A]DE8109219U (BOSCH) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5140169 (EVENS F MONTE ET AL) [A] 1,2,4,6,8 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 37 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US5078493 (EVENS F MONTE ET AL) [A] 1,2,6 * column 3, line 59 - line 67 * * figure 2 *; | [A]DE3729411 (DIEHL GMBH & CO) [A] 1,4,7 * figure .; claim - *; | [A]JPH04264535 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930202), vol. 017, no. 051, Database accession no. (P - 1479), & JP04264535 A 19920921 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO LTD) [A] 1,6,7 * abstract * |