EP0874084 - Scaffolding for the renovation of concrete bridges [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GfB Gesellschaft für Bauwerksabdichtungen mbH An der Eisernen Hand 2 56332 Wolken / DE | For all designated states Brühl, Markus, Dipl.-Ing. Emser Strasse 337 56076 Koblenz / DE | [1998/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berens, Wolfgang Haurother Strasse 25 56761 Masburg / DE | 02 /
Brühl, Markus, Dipl.-Ing. Emser Strasse 337 56076 Koblenz / DE | [1998/44] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 98107188.9 | 21.04.1998 | [1998/44] | Priority number, date | DE1997207488U | 25.04.1997 Original published format: DE 29707488 U | [1998/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0874084 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0874084 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E01D19/10, E01D22/00 | [1998/44] | CPC: |
E01D19/106 (EP);
E01D22/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/27] |
Former [1998/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | SI | 17.04.1999 | Title | German: | Arbeitsgerüst zur Sanierung von Betonbrücken | [1998/44] | English: | Scaffolding for the renovation of concrete bridges | [1998/44] | French: | Echafaudage pour la rénovation des ponts en béton | [1998/44] | Examination procedure | 17.04.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/24] | 29.04.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 14.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.07.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 29.10.2003 | GB | 29.10.2003 | IT | 29.10.2003 | NL | 29.10.2003 | BE | 30.04.2004 | [2008/12] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 29.10.2003 | |
GB | 29.10.2003 | ||
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
BE | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | GB | 29.10.2003 | |
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
BE | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/45] | GB | 29.10.2003 | |
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/33] | NL | 29.10.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3115239 (SCHNABEL WINFRIED DIPL ING) [X] 1 * the whole document *[A] 2,3,5,8,11; | [XAY]DE9107201U (KUNZ) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2,3,6,8,11 [Y] 5; | [YA]DE19526964 (HUNEKE OTTO [DE]) [Y] 5 * column 7, line 33 - column 8, line 8; figures 1,2,5 * [A] 1,8 |