EP0873821 - Lapping tape [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Kesao c/o TDK Corporation, 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kurose, Shigeo c/o TDK Corporation, 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1999/02] |
Former [1998/44] | 01 /
Okada, Keaso c/o TDK Corporation, 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Kurose, Shigeo c/o TDK Corporation, 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98107426.3 | 23.04.1998 | [1998/44] | Priority number, date | JP19970123198 | 25.04.1997 Original published format: JP 12319897 | [1998/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0873821 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0873821 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B24D11/00, B24D3/34, B24B21/00, // G11B5/84, G11B5/187 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
B24D11/005 (EP,US);
B24D11/00 (KR);
B24B21/00 (EP,US);
B24D3/34 (EP,US);
G11B5/1871 (EP,US);
G11B5/84 (EP,US);
G11B5/41 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24372 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24405 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24421 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/44] | B24D11/00, B24D3/34, B24B21/00, // G11B5/187 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, LU [2000/50] |
Former [1998/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Läppband | [1998/44] | English: | Lapping tape | [1998/44] | French: | Ruban de rodage | [1998/44] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 14.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/28] | 17.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08267363 ; | US5711772 [ ] (RYOKE KATSUMI [JP], et al) [ ] * column 10, line 47 - column 11, line 28 ** column 12, line 20 - line 31 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08267363 A 19961015 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract * |