EP0889259 - Side-bar chain for continuously variable cone pulley transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.02.2002 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | Applicant(s) | For all designated states P.I.V. Antrieb Werner Reimers GmbH & Co KG Industriestrasse 3 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | [1999/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagner, Peter Im Backenborn 2 35444 Biebertal / DE | 02 /
Schönnenbeck, Gert, Dr. Adelhartstrasse 63a 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | 03 /
Weitzel, Dirk Ringstrasse 24 63546 Hammersbach / DE | 04 /
Gerats, Jochen Jacobistrasse 13 61348 Bad Homburg / DE | 05 /
Maier, Manfred Heinrich-von-Kleist-Strasse 1 64380 Rossdorf / DE | 06 /
Wolf, Hans-Jürgen Ansbacher Strasse 34b 61350 Bad Homburg / DE | 07 /
Kell, Georg Max-Beckmann-Strasse 18 60599 Frankfurt / DE | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Petersen, Frank, et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Petersen, Frank, Dipl.-Ing., et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner, Patentanwälte Postfach 11 08 47 76058 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [1999/01] | Lemcke, Rupert, Dipl.-Ing., et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 40 26 76025 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 98107501.3 | 24.04.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | DE1997128181 | 02.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19728181 | [1999/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0889259 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16G5/18 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
F16G5/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1999/37] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Laschenkette für stufenlos verstellbare Kegelscheibengetriebe | [1999/01] | English: | Side-bar chain for continuously variable cone pulley transmission | [1999/01] | French: | Chaine à éclisses pour transmission constamment variable à palier conique | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/11] | 08.07.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 07.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.08.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE1065685 (WILHELM BESEL) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE3413384 (PIV ANTRIEB REIMERS KG WERNER [DE]) [AD] 1 * page 13, line 16 - page 15, line 24; figures 6-13 *; | [A]DE191629 (ALLINGHAM) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2356289 (REIMERS); | [AD]DE3027834 (PIV ANTRIEB REIMERS KG WERNER [DE]); | [AD]DE1145871 (REIMERS GETRIEBE KG); | [AD]DE3526062 (PIV ANTRIEB REIMERS KG WERNER [DE]) | by applicant | DE1065685 | DE2848167 | DE3027834 | DE3324318 | DE3447092 | DE3627815 | DE3819599 | DE3826809 | DE3413384 | DE1145871 | DE3526062 |