EP0880201 - Fuse plug [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.08.2000 [2000/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRONE GmbH Beeskowdamm 3-11 14167 Berlin / DE | [2000/13] |
Former [1998/48] | For all designated states KRONE Aktiengesellschaft Beeskowdamm 3-11 14167 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jaeger, Alfred Jim 17 Marilyn Crescent Tumbi Umbi NSW 2261 / AU | [1998/48] | Application number, filing date | 98107586.4 | 25.04.1998 | [1998/48] | Priority number, date | DE1997122936 | 23.05.1997 Original published format: DE 19722936 | [1998/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0880201 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0880201 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/24, H01R13/66, H01T1/12, H01T1/14, H01R13/502, H01R13/506, H01R13/68, H01R13/50 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
H01H85/54 (EP,US);
H01R9/265 (EP,US);
H01H85/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/48] | H01R9/24, H01R13/66, H01T1/12, H01T1/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sicherungsstecker | [1998/48] | English: | Fuse plug | [1998/48] | French: | Fiche avec un fusible | [1998/48] | Examination procedure | 06.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 29.06.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB676144 (BELLING & LEE LTD) [Y] 1 * page 1, lines 30-35; figures 3-5 *; | [X]US5154639 (KNOLL RUDOLF [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,5 * column 5, lines 10-38; figures 1,5 * * column 7, line 54 - column 8, line 5 *; | [Y]US5338224 (BLANKE UWE [DE], et al) [Y] 6 * column 2, lines 20-33 *; | [YA]US5546267 (FREDERIKSEN BJARNE [US], et al) [Y] 2,3,7 * column 7, line 50 - column 8, line 11; figures 1,2,5 *[A] 1; | [DY]US5574614 (BUSSE RALF-DIETER [DE], et al) [DY] 1-3,6,7 * column 3, lines 1-11 * * column 4, lines 16-29 * * column 4, lines 48-56; figure 1 * |