EP0881130 - Air bag for an occupant restraint system in a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Automotive GmbH Industriestrasse 20 73553 Alfdorf / DE | [2004/49] |
Former [1998/49] | For all designated states TRW Occupant Restraint Systems GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 20 73551 Alfdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Denz, Stefan Kirchweg 3 79713 Bad Säckingen / DE | 02 /
Lang, Norbert Am Ziegelrain 3 73575 Leinzell / DE | [1998/49] | Representative(s) | Degwert, Hartmut Prinz & Partner Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys. Prinz & Partner Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98107613.6 | 27.04.1998 | [1998/49] | Priority number, date | DE1997209389U | 28.05.1997 Original published format: DE 29709389 U | [1998/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0881130 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0881130 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | [1999/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0881130 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/24, B60R21/16 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
B60R21/23138 (EP,US);
B60R21/232 (EP,US);
B60R21/235 (EP,US);
B60R21/239 (EP,US);
D03D11/00 (EP,US);
B60R2021/23316 (EP,US);
B60R2021/23547 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/49] | B60R21/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/14] |
Former [1998/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gassack für ein Insassen-Rückhaltesystem in Fahrzeugen | [1998/49] | English: | Air bag for an occupant restraint system in a vehicle | [1998/49] | French: | Sac gonflable pour un système de retenue d'un passager dans un véhicule | [1998/49] | Examination procedure | 22.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 24.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 08.12.2004 | [2006/13] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5338061 (NELSON STEVEN R [US], et al) [A] 1,11,12 * column 6, lines 3-45; figure 3 *; | [A]DE4430412 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 1* columns 3-4; figures 2-5 *; | [A]EP0687596 (AIRBAGS INT LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5586782 (ZIMMERMAN II RONALD A [US], et al) [A] 1-4,14 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 38; figures 1-8 *; | [E]GB2318767 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]) [E] 1 * page 7, paragraph L - page 8, paragraph 2; figures 1,3 *; | [E]EP0875426 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [E] 1 * column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 12; figures 1-3 * |