EP0895364 - Frame structure for a multi-rate CDMA communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/21] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miya, Kazuyuki 1132-22, Kamiasao, Asao-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 215 / JP | 02 /
Uesugi, Mitsuru Room No. 13-33, Kamoi-so, 3-14-6, Kamoi, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 226 / JP | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98107977.5 | 30.04.1998 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | JP19970218005 | 29.07.1997 Original published format: JP 21800597 | [1999/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0895364 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0895364 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707, H04B7/26 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
H04B7/264 (EP,KR,US);
H04W16/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/41] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Rahmenstruktur für ein CDMA-Kommunikationssystem mit mehreren Bit-Raten | [1999/05] | English: | Frame structure for a multi-rate CDMA communication system | [1999/05] | French: | Structure de trame pour un système de communication CDMA multi-débit | [1999/05] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/08] | 20.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2005 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.10.2005 | 29.09.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.10.2005 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5020056 (CHENNAKESHU SANDEEP [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract ** column 2, line 63 - column 4, line 5; figure 1 *; | [XA]US5535239 (PADOVANI ROBERTO [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,13,14,16-18 * abstract * * column 2, line 8 - line 39 * * column 2, line 49 - line 61 * * column 5, line 35 - line 44 * * column 6, line 16 - line 31 * * column 7, line 27 - line 37 * * column 8, line 3 - line 4 * * column 11, line 25 - line 33 * * column 15, line 28 - column 17, line 26 * * column 18, line 14 - line 21 * [A] 8-10,12,20,21; | [X]WO9700562 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 8,9,13-16,20,21 * page 5, line 25 - page 6, line 18 * * page 17, line 37 - page 18, line 7 * * page 18, line 36 - line 17; figures 4,5; claims 1,7-9 *; | [A]US5610907 (BARRETT TERENCE W [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 24 * * column 4, line 57 - line 60 * * column 6, line 27 - line 47 * |