EP0881271 - Vibration absorbing, heat resistant, pressure sensitive acrylic adhesive composition and the adhesive tape made from it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lohmann GmbH & Co. KG Irlicher Strasse 55 56567 Neuwied / DE | [1998/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pahl, Andreas, Dr. Auf der Hohl 1 56567 Neuwied / DE | 02 /
Domanski, Reinhold Hochstrasse 124 56566 Neuwied / DE | [1998/49] | Representative(s) | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter Flaccus Müller-Wolff Patentanwälte Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter, Dr. Patentanwalt Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | Application number, filing date | 98108230.8 | 06.05.1998 | [1998/49] | Priority number, date | DE1997121846 | 26.05.1997 Original published format: DE 19721846 | [1998/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0881271 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0881271 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09J4/06, C09J133/06 | [1998/49] | CPC: |
C09J4/06 (EP);
C08F265/04 (EP);
C09J133/062 (EP);
C08L2666/36 (EP);
C09J2301/302 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F265/04, C08F222/40 (EP);
C09J133/062, C08L2666/36 (EP);
C09J4/06, C08F265/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/34] |
Former [1999/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, LI | ||
Former [1998/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | SI | 06.05.1998 | Title | German: | Schwingungsdämpfende, hitzebeständige, druckempfindliche Acrylatklebstoffzusammensetzung sowie ein daraus hergestelltes Haftklebeband | [1998/49] | English: | Vibration absorbing, heat resistant, pressure sensitive acrylic adhesive composition and the adhesive tape made from it | [1998/49] | French: | Composition d'adhésif acrylique absorbant de vibration, résistant à la chaleur et sensible à la pression et bande adhésive qui en est produite | [1998/49] | Examination procedure | 30.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/21] | 26.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.06.1999 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.1999 | 15.06.1999 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.1999 | 15.06.1999 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.1999 | 15.06.1999 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.1999 | 15.06.1999 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.1999 | 15.06.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.1999 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.1999 | 15.06.1999 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.1999 | 15.06.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 26.03.2003 | FR | 26.03.2003 | GB | 26.03.2003 | GR | 26.03.2003 | IE | 26.03.2003 | IT | 26.03.2003 | NL | 26.03.2003 | AT | 06.05.2003 | LU | 06.05.2003 | BE | 31.05.2003 | CH | 31.05.2003 | LI | 31.05.2003 | DK | 26.06.2003 | PT | 26.06.2003 | SE | 26.06.2003 | ES | 30.09.2003 | DE | 02.12.2003 | [2008/12] |
Former [2007/04] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
FR | 26.03.2003 | ||
GB | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
IE | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
AT | 06.05.2003 | ||
LU | 06.05.2003 | ||
BE | 31.05.2003 | ||
CH | 31.05.2003 | ||
LI | 31.05.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
DE | 02.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/43] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
FR | 26.03.2003 | ||
GB | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
AT | 06.05.2003 | ||
LU | 06.05.2003 | ||
BE | 31.05.2003 | ||
CH | 31.05.2003 | ||
LI | 31.05.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
DE | 02.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
FR | 26.03.2003 | ||
GB | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
LU | 06.05.2003 | ||
BE | 31.05.2003 | ||
CH | 31.05.2003 | ||
LI | 31.05.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
DE | 02.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/35] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
FR | 26.03.2003 | ||
GB | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.05.2003 | ||
CH | 31.05.2003 | ||
LI | 31.05.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
DE | 02.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GB | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.05.2003 | ||
CH | 31.05.2003 | ||
LI | 31.05.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
DE | 02.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GB | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.05.2003 | ||
CH | 31.05.2003 | ||
LI | 31.05.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GB | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.05.2003 | ||
LI | 31.05.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GB | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.05.2003 | ||
LI | 31.05.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 26.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9322391 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US], et al) [A] 1-13* example - *; | [A]WO9618701 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-13 * example - * |