EP0880152 - Method of manufacturing an SMD-plastic film capacitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2001 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westermann, Wolfgang Schellingstrasse 7 68165 Mannheim / DE | [1998/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/48] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost - Altenburg - Geissler - Isenbruck, Gallileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98108246.4 | 06.05.1998 | [1998/48] | Priority number, date | DE1997121678 | 23.05.1997 Original published format: DE 19721678 | [1998/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0880152 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0880152 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01G2/02, H01G2/10 | [1998/48] | CPC: |
H01G4/224 (EP);
H01G2/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/31] |
Former [1998/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines SMD-Kunststoffolienkondensators | [1998/48] | English: | Method of manufacturing an SMD-plastic film capacitor | [1998/48] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'un condensateur à film plastique destiné au montage en surface | [1998/48] | Examination procedure | 06.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 27.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.08.2000 | GB | 02.08.2000 | [2006/14] |
Former [2001/28] | GB | 02.08.2000 | |
FR | 29.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/24] | FR | 29.12.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0434451 (ELECTRONIC CONCEPTS INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 8 * * figures 1A,1D *; | [A]JPH03116812 ; | [A]DE2230859 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1 * Patentanspruch *;; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]EP0192818 (WESTERMANN WOLFGANG); | [DA]DE8612909U (WESTERMANN WOLFGANG) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910812), vol. 015, no. 315, Database accession no. (E - 1099), & JP03116812 A 19910517 (ELNA CO LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1 * abstract * |