EP0878778 - Digital printing, metering and recording of other post services on the face of a mail piece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes Inc. World Headquarters One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/47] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. World Headquarters, One Elmcroft Road Stamford Connecticut 06926-0700 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sansone, Ronald P. 4 Trails End Road Weston, Connecticut 06883 / US | [1998/47] | Representative(s) | Avery, Stephen John, et al Hoffmann Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/47] | Avery, Stephen John, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98108431.2 | 08.05.1998 | [1998/47] | Priority number, date | US19970848425 | 08.05.1997 Original published format: US 848425 | [1998/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0878778 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0878778 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/00 | [1998/47] | CPC: |
G07B17/00508 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00169 (EP,US);
G07B2017/0058 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00604 (EP,US);
G07B2017/0062 (EP,US);
G07B2017/0083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/17] |
Former [1998/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Digitales Drucken, Frankieren und Aufzeichnen von anderen Postdienstleistungen auf der Frontfläche eines Poststückes | [1998/47] | English: | Digital printing, metering and recording of other post services on the face of a mail piece | [1998/47] | French: | Système numérique pour imprimer, affranchir et enregistrer d'autres services postaux sur la face d'un objet postal | [1998/47] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/14] | 28.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/42] | 16.06.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/42] | 12.12.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.04.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5626286 (PETKOVSEK GLENN [US]) [X] 1-3,11,12 * column 4, line 58 - column 6, line 12 * * abstract * [A] 4,5,10; | [X]US4725718 (SANSONE RONALD P [US], et al) [X] 1-10,12 * column 4, line 18 - column 5, line 27 * * abstract *; | [XA]WO9714117 (E STAMP CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,6-10,12 * page 37, line 4 - line 16 * * claims 3,13,14 * * figures 1,9,13,16A,16B,18 * [A] 4,5; | [X]EP0331352 (ALCATEL BUSINESS SYSTEMS [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,10,12 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 22 * * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 6 * * abstract *; | [A] - Information Based Indicia Program (IBIP) Indicium Specification, JUNE 13, 1998, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, XP002137735 [A] 1,2,12 * Appendix A * | by applicant | US4831555 |