EP0956772 - Method for manufacturing a ringshaped salami and salami made by this method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H. & E. Reinert Westfälische Privat-Fleischerei GmbH & Co. KG Mittel-Loxten 37 33775 Versmold / DE | [2001/32] |
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states H. & E. Reinert KG Westfälische Privat-Fleischerei Mittel-Loxten 37 33775 Versmold / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klemend, Uwe Schlaunstrasse 8 33739 Bielefeld / DE | 02 /
Koch, Michael Margarete-Windhorst-Strasse 42 33790 Halle / DE | 03 /
Lembke, Gunther H. Am Urberg 14a 49186 Bad Iburg / DE | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Stracke, Alexander, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing., et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 98108499.9 | 11.05.1998 | [1999/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0956772 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0956772 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A22C11/00 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
A22C11/00 (EP);
A23L13/65 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL, SE [2000/30] |
Former [1999/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer ringförmigen Salami sowie eine nach dem Verfahren hergestellte Salami | [1999/46] | English: | Method for manufacturing a ringshaped salami and salami made by this method | [1999/46] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un salami annulaire et salami fabriqué dans ce procédé | [1999/46] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 18.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 19.09.2001 | GB | 19.09.2001 | NL | 19.09.2001 | SE | 19.12.2001 | AT | 11.05.2002 | LU | 11.05.2002 | BE | 31.05.2002 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/39] | GB | 19.09.2001 | |
NL | 19.09.2001 | ||
SE | 19.12.2001 | ||
AT | 11.05.2002 | ||
LU | 11.05.2002 | ||
BE | 31.05.2002 | ||
Former [2004/16] | GB | 19.09.2001 | |
NL | 19.09.2001 | ||
SE | 19.12.2001 | ||
AT | 11.05.2002 | ||
BE | 31.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | GB | 19.09.2001 | |
NL | 19.09.2001 | ||
AT | 11.05.2002 | ||
BE | 31.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/47] | GB | 19.09.2001 | |
NL | 19.09.2001 | ||
AT | 11.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | GB | 19.09.2001 | |
NL | 19.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/37] | GB | 19.09.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3814560 (SMADAR Y, et al); | [A]DE2315442 (PFLEIDERER PETER); | [A]DE2406090 (PFLEIDERER PETER); | [A]EP0183601 (SOPARIND [FR]); | [X]DE3818319 (REUTZEL REINER [DE]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * |