EP0880197 - Clamping screw for connecting electrical conductors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2001 [2001/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meier, Markus, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Blumenthalstrasse 27 92286 Rieden / DE | 02 /
Zinner, Reinhard, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Im Sandtal 5 92439 Bodenwöhr / DE | 03 /
Fischer, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Pilsheim 46 93133 Burglengenfeld / DE | 04 /
Scharf, Anton Triftweg 4 92263 Ebermannsdorf / DE | [1998/48] | Application number, filing date | 98108541.8 | 11.05.1998 | [1998/48] | Priority number, date | DE1997209111U | 23.05.1997 Original published format: DE 29709111 U | [1998/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0880197 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0880197 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/30, H01R4/36, H01R4/38, H01R9/09 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
H01R4/38 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/48] | H01R4/30, H01R4/36, H01R4/38 | Designated contracting states | [2000/37] |
Former [1998/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schraubklemme zum Anschliessen elektrischer Leiter | [1998/48] | English: | Clamping screw for connecting electrical conductors | [1998/48] | French: | Duille de contact à vis pour la connexion de conducteurs électriques | [1998/48] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/10] | 12.10.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.08.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.08.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2358575 (KEDVES LOUIS) [X] 1-3 * column 2, lines 6-13 * * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 6; figures 1,2,5A-5F *; | [X]DE2502675 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1-3 * column 1, lines 35-40 * * column 1, lines 56-64 * * column 2, lines 48-64; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0769826 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA) [A] 1-3 * column 2, lines 36-48; figure 5 * |