EP0878754 - Process for interacting with a computer, display and interface for using this process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Münker, Kerstin Reeshoop 10 22926 Ahrensburg / DE | [1998/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/47] | Representative(s) | Reuther, Martin Patentanwalt Zehnthofstrasse 9 52349 Düren / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | Reuther, Martin Patentanwalt Zehnthofstrasse 9 52349 Düren / DE | ||
Former [1998/47] | Castell, Klaus, Dr. Schillingsstrasse 335 52355 Düren / DE | Application number, filing date | 98108762.0 | 14.05.1998 | [1998/47] | Priority number, date | DE19971020051 | 14.05.1997 Original published format: DE 19720051 | [1998/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0878754 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0878754 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033 | [1998/47] | CPC: |
G06F3/0488 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Interaktion mit einem Rechner, Benutzungsoberfläche und Benutzungsschnittstelle | [1998/47] | English: | Process for interacting with a computer, display and interface for using this process | [1998/47] | French: | Procédé d'interaction avec un ordinateur, affichage et interface à d'utilisation de ce procédé | [1998/47] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 24.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/21] | 09.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2007 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.08.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 11.08.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5539429 (YANO HARUTO [JP] ET AL) [Y] 1-13 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 11 *; | [A]US5574482 (NIEMEIER CHARLES J [US]) [A] 1-13 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 2 *; | [PA]EP0773496 (IBM [US]) [PA] 1-13 * figures 1-6; claims 1-6 *; | [A]EP0498082 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-13 * figures 3,7; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2301217 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1-13 * claim 1 * | [Y] - TOUCH-PANEL INTERFACE SYSTEM FOR DETECTING MORE THAN THREE TYPES OF CLICK OPERATIONS, IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, PAGE(S) 63-65, (199609), ISSN 0018-8689, XP000638232 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - MOUSE EMULATION FOR DIGITIZER/TOUCH PANEL, IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, PAGE(S) 216-217, (19901201), ISSN 0018-8689, XP000108457 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |