EP0880217 - Assembly of a combustion engine, an electrical generator and a pump unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STILL GmbH Berzeliusstrasse 10 22113 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | For all designated states STILL GMBH Berzeliusstrasse 10 D-22113 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schröder, Werner-Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Landwehrstrasse 38 63762 Grossostheim / DE | 02 /
Schäfer, Arno, Dipl.-Ing. Dietzweg 3 22119 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Tügel, Caspar, Dipl.-Ing. Mansteinstrasse 38 20253 Hamburg / DE | [1998/48] | Representative(s) | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde Aktiengesellschaft Patent und Marken Dr.-Carl-von-Lindestrasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde Aktiengesellschaft, Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 98109038.4 | 18.05.1998 | [1998/48] | Priority number, date | DE1997121527 | 22.05.1997 Original published format: DE 19721527 | [1998/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0880217 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0880217 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/18, H02K9/19, H02K7/00, F04B17/05 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
H02K7/00 (EP);
H02K7/1815 (EP,KR);
H02K5/20 (US);
F04B17/05 (EP,KR);
H02K5/203 (EP,KR);
H02K9/19 (KR);
F01M2001/0215 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/48] | H02K7/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/18] |
Former [1998/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Baueinheit aus Verbrennungsmotor, Generator und Pumpenaggregat | [1998/48] | English: | Assembly of a combustion engine, an electrical generator and a pump unit | [1998/48] | French: | Ensemble moteur à combustion interne, génératrice électrique et unité de pompage | [1998/48] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 01.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/24] | 08.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0988807 ; | [A]US4320431 (BELL CLIFFORD J) [A] 1-3 * column A * * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 6 * * column 5, lines 41-57; figure 2 *; | [A]US4980588 (OGAWA HITOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 3; figure 2 *; | [DA]EP0666634 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]) [DA] 1,13-15* abstract *; | [PX]FR2742606 (RENAULT [FR]) [PX] 1-3,13 * abstract * * page 5, line 7 - page 7, line 10; figures 1-4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 1997, no. 7, & JP09088807 A 19970331 (YUKEN KOGYO CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |