EP0882997 - Laminated safety mirror with reflective coating adjacent the bonding layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2004 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.12.2004 [2004/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kellman-Turek, Cheri L. 291 Good Court Des Plaines, IL 60016 / US | [2001/29] |
Former [1998/50] | For all designated states Globe-Amerada Glass Company 2001 Greenleaf Avenue Elk Grove Village, IL 60007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/29] |
Former [1998/50] | 01 /
Kellman-Turek, Cheri L. 291 Good Court Des Plaines, Il 60016 / US | Representative(s) | Borchert, Uwe Rudolf, et al Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/50] | Borchert, Uwe Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Puschmann & Borchert Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98109167.1 | 20.05.1998 | [1998/50] | Priority number, date | US19970870307 | 06.06.1997 Original published format: US 870307 | [1998/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0882997 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/10, G02B5/08, B32B17/10 | [1998/50] | CPC: |
B32B17/10036 (EP,US);
B32B17/1022 (EP,US);
B32B17/1077 (EP,US);
B32B17/10853 (EP,US);
B32B17/10862 (EP,US);
C03C17/3663 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1999/33] |
Former [1998/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Laminierter Sicherheitsspiegel mit reflektierender Beschichtung auf der Bindungsschicht | [1998/50] | English: | Laminated safety mirror with reflective coating adjacent the bonding layer | [1998/50] | French: | Miroir de sécurité laminé avec revêtement réfléchissant adjacent à la couche de liaison | [1998/50] | Examination procedure | 19.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 10.06.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, GR, IE, MC, PT | 18.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.08.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   11.06.2002 | 31.05.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   19.11.2003 | 31.05.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5122905 (WHEATLEY JOHN A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9 * column 2, line 48 - line 53 * * column 3, line 1 - line 8 * * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 14 * * column 4, line 44 - line 46 * [A] 3,10; | [DXA]US4511618 (DUCHENE ELOI [BE], et al) [DX] 1 * column 3, line 56 - line 68; figure 1 * * column 4, line 39 - column 5, line 39; figures 4,5 * [A] 4,5,7,9; | [A]US5450235 (SMITH KENNETH L [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * column 5, line 40 - line 42; figure 1 * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 33 * * column 9, line 46 - line 50 *; | [A]US5117304 (HUANG TZU-LI J [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * column 5, line 12 - line 14 * * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 20; figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP0286225 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 3,10 * page 3, line 12 - line 42 *; | [DA]US2468568 (MCCUSKER CHARLES A) [DA] 1,7 * column 2, line 16 - line 53; figure . * |