EP0880087 - Power supply circuit and CCD camera using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
Former [1998/48] | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagase, Kenji 19-13, Akai Daito-shi, Osaka / JP | [1998/48] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98109228.1 | 20.05.1998 | [1998/48] | Priority number, date | JP19970131786 | 22.05.1997 Original published format: JP 13178697 | JP19970131787 | 22.05.1997 Original published format: JP 13178797 | [1998/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0880087 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0880087 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | [2000/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0880087 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/46, H02M1/00, H02M3/335 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
H02M1/32 (EP,US);
H02M3/155 (EP,US);
H02M3/335 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/24] | G05F1/46, H02M1/00 | ||
Former IPC [1998/48] | G05F1/46 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/18] |
Former [1998/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Stromversorgungsschaltung und damit vorsorgte CCD-Kamera | [1998/48] | English: | Power supply circuit and CCD camera using same | [1998/48] | French: | Circuit d'alimentation de puissance et caméra CCD l'utilisant | [1998/48] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 24.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02017891.9 / EP1271757 | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 12.11.2003 | [2006/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH06111978 ; | [X]JPH0744134 ; | [A]JPS58136137 ; | [A]JPS6140075 ; | [A]JPH02287807 ; | [A]JPH0564432 ; | [A]EP0503715 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 4,5,7* figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0676854 (VLT CORP [US]) [Y] 4,5,7 * column 9, line 8 - line 11 * * figure 5 *; | [Y]GB2293663 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 4,5,7 * figures 1,3 * * column 1, line 14 - line 26 * * column 7, line 23 - column 8, line 13 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940719), vol. 18, no. 382, Database accession no. (E - 1580), & JP06111978 A 19940422 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS) [X] 1-3,6 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950630), vol. 1995, no. 5, & JP07044134 A 19950214 (NEC. CORP.) [X] 1-3,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831102), vol. 7, no. 247, Database accession no. (E - 208), & JP58136137 A 19830813 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO) [A] 1-3,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860710), vol. 10, no. 197, Database accession no. (E - 418), & JP61040075 A 19860226 (NEC CORP.) [A] 1-3,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910214), vol. 15, no. 63, Database accession no. (P - 1166), & JP02287807 A 19901127 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.) [A] 1-3,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930719), vol. 0, no. 0, & JP05064432 A 19930312 (TOKYO ELECTRIC) [A] 4,5,7 * abstract * |