EP0884776 - Isolation structure for DRAM cell with trench capacitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alsmeier, Johann 4 Marlyn Drive Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Buchner, Mussgnug Neunert, Göhring Waldstrasse 33 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98109820.5 | 29.05.1998 | [1998/51] | Priority number, date | US19970873100 | 11.06.1997 Original published format: US 873100 | [1998/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0884776 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0884776 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/8242, H01L27/108 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
H10B12/37 (EP,KR,US);
H10B12/038 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [2002/27] |
Former [1998/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Isolationsstruktur für DRAM-Zelle mit Graben-Kondensator | [1998/51] | English: | Isolation structure for DRAM cell with trench capacitor | [1998/51] | French: | Structure isolante pour cellule DRAM avec capacité ensillonée | [1998/51] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 18.04.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.08.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, LU, MC, PT, SE | 03.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/23] | 08.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.05.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5369049 (ACOCELLA JOYCE E [US], et al); | [X]US5521422 (MANDELMAN JACK A [US], et al); | [X]US5539229 (NOBLE JR WENDELL P [US], et al); | [X]US5614431 (DEBROSSE JOHN K [US]) |