EP0893090 - Panel for furniture, especially for a dishwasher cupboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gronbach, Wilfried Weikertsham 14 83549 Eiselfing / DE | [1999/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/04] | Representative(s) | Zinnecker, Armin, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Zinnecker, Armin, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/04] | Zinnecker, Armin, Dipl.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98109844.5 | 29.05.1998 | [1999/04] | Priority number, date | DE1997212902U | 21.07.1997 Original published format: DE 29712902 U | [1999/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0893090 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/42 | [1999/04] | CPC: |
A47L15/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1999/40] |
Former [1999/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Blende für einen Einrichtungsgegenstand, insbesondere für einen Blendenkasten für eine Geschirrspülmaschine | [1999/04] | English: | Panel for furniture, especially for a dishwasher cupboard | [1999/04] | French: | Façade de meuble, en particulier pour armoire à lave-vaisselle | [1999/04] | Examination procedure | 29.07.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/22] | 02.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0543696 (ESSWEIN SA) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0261083 (SMEG SPA) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0632156 (MERLONI ELETTRODOMESTICI SPA) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0718459 (WHIRLPOOL EUROP ;BAUKNECHT HAUSGERAETE (DE)) [A] 1,8 * the whole document * |