EP0893631 - Metallic flat gasket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REINZ-Dichtungs-GmbH Reinzstrasse 3-7 89233 Neu-Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | For all designated states REINZ-DICHTUNGS-GMBH Reinzstrasse 3-7 89233 Neu-Ulm / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katzmaier, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Ringstrasse 4 89179 Beimerstetten / DE | 02 /
Kögel, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. Insel 20 89231 Neu-Ulm / DE | 03 /
Ludwig, Josef Albstrasse 33 89168 Niederstotzingen / DE | 04 /
Popielas, Frank, Dipl.-Ing. Eckstrasse 7 89250 Senden / DE | 05 /
Quick, Lothar Hauptstrasse 44 89278 Nersingen / DE | 06 /
Unseld, Günther Silcherstrasse 11 89189 Neenstetten / DE | 07 /
Weiss, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Kastanienweg 1 89231 Neu-Ulm / DE | [1999/04] | Representative(s) | Tomerius, Isabel, et al Lang & Tomerius Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Tomerius, Isabel, Dr., et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Postfach 151324 80048 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/30] | Tomerius, Isabel, et al Patentanwälte Weber & Heim Bavariaring 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/04] | Tomerius, Isabel, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Weber & Heim, Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98109870.0 | 29.05.1998 | [1999/04] | Priority number, date | DE19971031493 | 22.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19731493 | [1999/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0893631 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0893631 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | [1999/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/08 | [1999/04] | CPC: |
F16J15/0818 (EP);
F16J2015/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/13] |
Former [1999/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Metallische Flachdichtung | [1999/04] | English: | Metallic flat gasket | [1999/04] | French: | Joint plat métallique | [1999/04] | Examination procedure | 12.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/37] | 22.01.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 03.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/27] | 15.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.02.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0773392 (SPECIALIST SEALING LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,11-13* abstract * | by applicant | EP0230804 | EP0306766 |