EP0881265 - Mildew resistant organopolysiloxane compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakamoto, Takafumi, c/o Silicone Denshi Zairyo Cijutsu Kenkyusho Shin-Etsu Ch.Co.Ltd. 1-10 Hitomi Ohaza Matsuida-machi Usui-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Sato, Tokuo, c/o Silicone Denshi Zairyo Cijutsu Kenkyusho Shin-Etsu Ch.Co.Ltd. 1-10 Hitomi Ohaza Matsuida-machi Usui-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | [1998/49] | Representative(s) | Tönhardt, Marion Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | Tönhardt, Marion, Dr. Forrester & Boehmert, Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/49] | Klöpsch, Gerald, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltssozietät, Benrather Schlossallee 53 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 98109923.7 | 29.05.1998 | [1998/49] | Priority number, date | JP19970157873 | 30.05.1997 Original published format: JP 15787397 | [1998/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0881265 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0881265 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | [1999/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0881265 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/04, C08K13/00, C08K5/3472 | [1999/24] | CPC: |
C08K5/3472 (EP,US);
C08K5/0058 (EP,US);
C08K5/378 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/0058, C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C08K5/3472, C08L83/04 (US,EP);
C08K5/378, C08L83/04 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/49] | C08L83/04, C08K13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/08] |
Former [1998/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gegen Schimmel beständige Organopolysiloxanzusammensetzungen | [1998/49] | English: | Mildew resistant organopolysiloxane compositions | [1998/49] | French: | Compositions d'organopolysiloxane résistant aux moisissures | [1998/49] | Examination procedure | 18.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/03] | 20.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPH02306907 [ ] (HOKKO CHEM IND CO, et al); | [D]JPH0640821 (TOSHIBA SILICONE); | [Y]EP0585587 (TOSHIBA SILICONE [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * page 3, line 3 - line 6 * * page 3, line 43 - line 46 * * page 4, line 39 - page 5, line 11 * * page 5, line 15 - line 16 * * page 5, line 47 * * page 7, line 34 - page 8, line 11 * * examples 1,3 * * claim 1 *; | JPH0925410 [ ] (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19970421), vol. 126, no. 16, Database accession no. 212841, XP002100460 [Y] 1-12 * abstract * | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19910708), vol. 115, no. 1, Database accession no. 3163, XP002100918 [Y] 1-12 * abstract * |