EP0881633 - Laser beam emitting device and an optical pickup provided with the laser beam emitting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2002 [2002/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsumi Electric Company Ltd. 8-8-2, Kokuryo-cho Chofu-shi Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | For all designated states Mitsumi Electric Company Ltd. 8-8-2, Kokuryo-cho Chofu-shi Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masakado, Osamu c/o Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd., 8-8-2, Kokuryo-cho Chofu-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kan, Kenji c/o Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd., 8-8-2, Kokuryo-cho Chofu-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1998/49] | Representative(s) | Solf, Alexander Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | Solf, Alexander, Dr. Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98109951.8 | 29.05.1998 | [1998/49] | Priority number, date | JP19970154323 | 29.05.1997 Original published format: JP 15432397 | [1998/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0881633 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0881633 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | [1998/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0881633 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/125, H01S5/068 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
G11B7/131 (EP,US);
G11B7/126 (EP,US);
G11B7/133 (EP,US);
H01S5/005 (EP,US);
H01S5/0683 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/49] | G11B7/125, H01S3/133 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/33] |
Former [1998/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Laserstrahlemittierende Vorrichtung und mit dieser Vorrichtung versehener optischer Abtastkopf | [1998/49] | English: | Laser beam emitting device and an optical pickup provided with the laser beam emitting device | [1998/49] | French: | Dispositif d'émission d'un faisceau laser et tête de lecture optique muni d'un tel dispositif | [1998/49] | Examination procedure | 29.05.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 08.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/32] | 02.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 03.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0581695 ; | [X]JPH03276432 ; | [X]US4721850 (SAKAI MITSUGU [JP], et al) [X] 1,5 * column 4, line 24 - line 27; figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP0426035 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] * the whole document *; | [X]EP0623922 (NIPPON CONLUX CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * column 5, line 46 - line 55; figures 3,4C,4D *; | [X]US5539718 (HOSHI HIROAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,5 * column 6, line 13 - column 7, line 15; figures 1,3 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930805), vol. 017, no. 422, Database accession no. (P - 1586), & JP05081695 A 19930402 (RICOH CO LTD) [X] 1,5 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920311), vol. 016, no. 100, Database accession no. (P - 1323), & JP03276432 A 19911206 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,5 * abstract * |