EP0893238 - Method for providing a shoe with a latex sole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesswein, Hannes Faberstrasse 17b 6230 Brixlegg / AT | For all designated states Giesswein, Werner Judenwiese 9a 6230 Brixlegg / AT | [1999/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/04] | Representative(s) | Torggler, Paul Norbert, et al Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | Torggler, Paul Norbert, et al Wilhelm-Greilstrasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 98109957.5 | 02.06.1998 | [1999/04] | Priority number, date | AT19970001270 | 25.07.1997 Original published format: AT 127097 | AT19970001437 | 26.08.1997 Original published format: AT 143797 | [1999/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0893238 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0893238 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0893238 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B29D31/508, A43B3/10, A43B9/18 | [1999/04] | CPC: |
B29D35/06 (EP);
A43B3/108 (EP);
B29D35/064 (EP);
B29D35/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, IT [2000/48] |
Former [1999/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Versehen eines Schuhs mit einer Sohle aus Latex-material | [1999/04] | English: | Method for providing a shoe with a latex sole | [1999/04] | French: | Procédé pour le revêtement d'une chaussure avec une semelle en latex | [1999/04] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 23.09.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 01.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.10.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.06.2003 | [2005/11] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2538673 (ANSLEY DONAHUE PAUL) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]GB992783 (AMERICAN RES AND DEV COMPANY) [X] 1-4,8-16 * page 3, line 115 - page 4, line 109; figure - * * page 2, line 130 - page 3, line 25 * | by applicant | DE3616874 | US5032330 |