EP0867504 - Oxidation-stable alpha-amylase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.04.2011 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2011 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 18.05.2011 [2011/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC. 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | [2003/10] |
Former [1998/40] | For all designated states GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC. 4 Cambridge Place, 1870 Winton Road South Rochester, New York 14618 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Solheim, Leif 900 2d Ave South Clinton, Lowa 52732 / US | 02 /
Power, Scott D. 524 Poplar Avenue San Bruno, CA 94066 / US | 03 /
Requadt, Carol A. 4094 Paradise Drive Tiburon, CA 94920 / US | 04 /
Mitchinson, Colin 381 Myrtle Street Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US | [1998/50] |
Former [1998/40] | 01 /
Solheim, Leif 900 2d Ave South Clinton, Lowa 52732 / US | ||
02 /
Power, Scott D. 732 Olive Court San Bruno, CA 94066 / US | |||
03 /
Requadt, Carol A. 4094 Paradise Drive Tiburon, CA 94920 / US | |||
04 /
Mitchinson, Colin 381 Myrtle Street Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US | Representative(s) | Armitage, Ian Michael, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | Armitage, Ian Michael, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1998/40] | Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98109967.4 | 10.02.1994 | [1998/40] | Priority number, date | US19930016395 | 11.02.1993 Original published format: US 16395 | [1998/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0867504 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0867504 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0867504 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/28, C12N15/56, C11D3/386 | [1998/40] | CPC: |
C12N9/2417 (EP,KR,US);
C11D3/386 (EP,US);
C12N15/52 (KR);
C12N15/75 (EP,US);
C12P19/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/40] | Title | German: | Oxidationsstabile Alpha-Amylase | [1998/40] | English: | Oxidation-stable alpha-amylase | [1998/40] | French: | Alpha-amylase stable à l'oxydation | [1998/40] | Examination procedure | 02.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/40] | 02.06.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 17.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 22.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 04.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 07.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94909609.3 / EP0689589 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.02.2004
28.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE NOVOZYMES A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK Opponent's representative Jensen, Bo Hammer Novozymes A/S Patents Krogshöjvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.02.2004
28.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE NOVOZYMES A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK Opponent's representative Jensen, Bo Hammer Novozymes A/S Patents Krogshöjvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | ||
Former [2004/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.02.2004
NOVOZYMES A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK Opponent's representative Bendiksen, Henrik Novozymes A/S, Patents, Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 07.05.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.01.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.05.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.06.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.02.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.06.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.12.2010 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.12.2010 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 04.04.2011 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 10.09.2009 | Appeal received No. T1849/09 | 19.11.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.12.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 11.09.2009 | Appeal received No. T1849/09 | 13.11.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.12.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 29.08.2006 | Appeal received No. T1300/06 | 30.10.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.04.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 18.08.2006 | Appeal received No. T1300/06 | 25.10.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.04.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 08.12.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.12.2010 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1999 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   03.12.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.05.2003 | GR | 02.08.2003 | IE | 10.02.2004 | LU | 10.02.2004 | MC | 28.02.2004 | [2005/23] |
Former [2005/19] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
IE | 10.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
GR | 02.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 02.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0410498 (GIST BROCADES NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-19; | [A]WO9116423 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 1-19; | [Y] - ESTELL D.A. ET AL, "Engineering an Enzyme by Site-directed Mutagenesis to Be Resistant to Chemical Oxidation", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1985), vol. 260, no. 11, pages 6518 - 6521, XP002900193 [Y] 1-19 | [A] - JOYET P. ET AL, "Hyperthemostable variants of a highly thermostable alpha-amylase", BIOTECHNOLOGY, (199212), vol. 10, pages 1579 - 1583, XP002900194 [A] 1-19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1292-1579 | Examination | WO9402597 |