EP0886077 - Brake shoe operating device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nisshinbo Industries, Inc. 31-11, Nihonbashi Ningyocho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/52] | For all designated states Nisshinbo Industries, Inc. 31-11, Nihonbashi Ningyocho 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-0013 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Michinori, Takashima, Nisshinbo Ind. Inc. Nagoya 14-25 Toyoda 5-chome, Minami-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 457-0841 / JP | [1998/52] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/52] | Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98110556.2 | 09.06.1998 | [1998/52] | Priority number, date | JP19970168182 | 10.06.1997 Original published format: JP 16818297 | [1998/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0886077 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0886077 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | [1999/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/22, F16D65/24 | [1998/52] | CPC: |
F16D65/22 (EP);
F16D2125/66 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/33] |
Former [1998/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bremsbackebetätigungsvorrichtung | [1998/52] | English: | Brake shoe operating device | [1998/52] | French: | Dispositif d'actionnement d'un segment de frein | [1998/52] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 19.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/23] | 30.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1135994 (GIRLING LIMITED) [X] 1-4 * page 2, line 34 - line 63; figures 1,3 * * page 2, line 92 - line 122; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US4535875 (ENGLAND MICHAEL J ET AL) [A] 1-4 * column 4, line 22 - line 58; figure 2 *; | [A]US4688661 (GOCKEL HARALD ET AL) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]US4705147 (PRESSACO PIERRE ET AL) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 31; figure 1 *; | [A]US3874483 (FARR GLYN PHILLIP REGINALD) [A] 1-4 * column 5, line 23 - column 6, line 25; figure 3 * |