EP0892117 - Toilet cistern flush valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Georg Fischer Schwab GmbH postfach 27 65 72717 Reutlingen / DE | [2000/30] |
Former [1999/03] | For all designated states Schwab Sanitär-Plastic GmbH Marktstrasse 155 72793 Pfullingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klimek, Ernst Im Wiesental 8 72829 Engstingen / DE | [1999/03] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Wolfgang Georg Fischer AG Patentabteilung Amsler-Laffon-Strasse 9 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | [2009/49] |
Former [2002/14] | Weiss, Wolfgang, Dr. c/o Georg Fischer AG, Amsler-Laffon-Strasse 9 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [1999/03] | KOHLER SCHMID + PARTNER Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 98110648.7 | 10.06.1998 | [1999/03] | Priority number, date | DE1997130271 | 15.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19730271 | [1999/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0892117 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0892117 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E03D1/14 | [1999/03] | CPC: |
E03D1/144 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, LU, NL [1999/39] |
Former [1999/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ablaufarmatur für eine Spülkasten | [2003/21] | English: | Toilet cistern flush valve | [1999/03] | French: | Dispositif d'écoulement pour un réservoir de chasse d'eau | [2003/21] |
Former [1999/03] | Ablaufarmatur eines Spülkastens | ||
Former [1999/03] | Dispositif d'écoulement d'un réservoir de chasse d'eau | Examination procedure | 23.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/12] | 31.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 22.10.2003 | LU | 10.06.2004 | [2006/14] |
Former [2005/23] | LU | 10.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2576620 (OURADOU FRANCIS [FR]) [A] 1,3,5-8 * page 11, line 28 - page 12; figure 5 *; | [A]DE3123501 (KUEHMSTEDT PETER) [A] 1,3,5-8 * page 9, line 9 - page 10, paragraph 1 *; | [AD]DE19501355 (ABU PLAST KUNSTSTOFF [DE]) [AD] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19501355 |