EP0886170 - Liquid crystal display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stanley Electric Co., Ltd. 2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo 153 / JP | [2008/42] |
Former [1998/52] | For all designated states Stanley Electric Co., Ltd. 2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo 153 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Tsuyoshi c/o Stanley Electric Co., Ltd., 1-3-1, Edanishi Aoba-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1998/52] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/52] | Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98110706.3 | 10.06.1998 | [1998/52] | Priority number, date | JP19970163142 | 19.06.1997 Original published format: JP 16314297 | [1998/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0886170 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0886170 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | [1999/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0886170 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1335, G02F1/1347, G02F1/139 | [1998/52] | CPC: |
G02F1/133636 (EP,US);
G02F1/1393 (EP,US);
G02F1/1396 (EP,US);
G02F2413/02 (EP,US);
G02F2413/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/26] |
Former [1998/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung | [1998/52] | English: | Liquid crystal display device | [1998/52] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à cristal liquide | [1998/52] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/23] | 18.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01219720 ; | [XA]DE3911620 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 10 * page 2, line 45 - page 3, line 22 * * page 6, line 42 - line 52; figure 1 * [A] 1,6-8; | [XA]US5243451 (KANEMOTO AKIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 10 * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 56; figure 1 * [A] 1-9; | [XA]EP0576931 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,9,10 * embodiments 2, 4 *;; figures 5,6,9-11 * [A] 3-5 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891128), vol. 013, no. 533, Database accession no. (P - 967), & JP01219720 A 19890901 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |