EP0907159 - Active matrix liquid crystal display panel and method of driving the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2002 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
Former [1999/30] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka / JP | ||
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Otani, Teruya 306 Izuminosanraifu, 17-35, Izuminomachi 6-chome Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa 921-8034 / JP | [1999/14] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98110819.4 | 12.06.1998 | [1999/14] | Priority number, date | JP19970156900 | 13.06.1997 Original published format: JP 15690097 | [1999/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0907159 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0907159 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | [1999/23] | Type: | A3 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0907159 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | [1999/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0907159 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36, G02F1/136 | [1999/23] | CPC: |
G09G3/3659 (EP);
G09G2300/0876 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/14] | G09G3/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/08] |
Former [1999/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallanzeigegerät mit aktiver Matrix und Steuerungsverfahren dafür | [1999/14] | English: | Active matrix liquid crystal display panel and method of driving the same | [1999/14] | French: | Panneau d'affichage à cristaux liquides àmatrice active et sa méthode de commande | [1999/14] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1998 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 08.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0622655 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD.) [X] 1,5 * column 24, line 52 - column 26, line 15 * * column 21, line 21 - column 23, line 7; figures 12,22,27 * * column 20, line 10 - line 24; figures 20,21 * * column 16, line 33 - column 18, line 28; figures 13-17 * * column 11, line 9 - column 12, line 10; figures 1,4,8,10 * * column 5, line 17 - line 22 * * column 3, line 7 - line 15 * * Abstract *; column 1, line 5 - line 10 * [Y] 3,6; | [XY]EP0535954 (K.K.TOSHIBA) [X] 1 * Abstract *; column 7, line 20 - column 9, line 43; figures 1-4E * [Y] 2; | [YA]US5517342 (KIM ET AL.) [Y] 2 * column 3, line 38 - column 5, line 42; figures 3,4 * * Abstract *; column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 51; figure 1 * [A] 4; | [A]EP0373565 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO.) [A] 1,3,5,6 * Abstract *; column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 16; figures 1,5-9,11-12B * * column 8, line 57 - column 9, line 31 * * column 10, line 14 - column 12, line 39 * * column 13, line 9 - line 16 *; | [A]EP0691565 (NEC CO.) [A] 6 * Abstract *; column 4, line 6 - line 55; figures 3-5 *; | [YP]JPH10123482 | [YP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 98, no. 10, & JP10123482 A 19980515 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND. CO. LTD.) [YP] 3,6 * abstract * |