EP0887371 - Process for preparing composite polymeric materials having high resistance to impact energy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/01] | Composite polymeric material having high resistance to impact energy | ||
[2004/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 28.06.2006 [2006/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monaci, Roberto Via Fregene, 13 30038 Spinea (Venezia) / IT | [1999/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati S.p.A. Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1999/01] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98111366.5 | 19.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | IT1997TV00085 | 25.06.1997 Original published format: IT TV970085 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0887371 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0887371 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/35, C08L75/04, B32B27/40, A42B3/06 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
C08J9/35 (EP,US);
A42B3/12 (EP,US);
A42C2/00 (EP,US);
B29C67/246 (EP,US);
B32B27/40 (EP,US);
C08J9/0061 (EP,US);
C08L75/04 (EP,US);
F16F1/37 (EP,US);
B29C67/207 (EP,US);
B60R13/02 (EP,US);
B60R13/04 (EP,US);
B60R21/04 (EP,US);
C08G2270/00 (EP,US);
C08J2375/04 (EP,US);
C08J2423/00 (EP,US);
C08J2425/00 (EP,US);
C08L25/06 (EP,US);
C08L71/12 (EP,US);
Y10S428/909 (EP,US);
Y10S521/904 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249978 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L75/04, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT, SE [1999/36] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Methode zur Herstellung von Komposit-Polymermaterialien, die hohe Festigkeit gegenüber Schlagenergie aufweisen | [2004/48] | English: | Process for preparing composite polymeric materials having high resistance to impact energy | [2004/48] | French: | Procédé de preparation des matériaux polymères composites à haute résistance à l'énergie d'impact | [2004/48] |
Former [1999/01] | Komposit-Polymermaterial, das hohe Festigkeit gegenüber Schlagenergie hat | ||
Former [1999/01] | Composite polymeric material having high resistance to impact energy | ||
Former [1999/01] | Matériau polymère composite à haute résistance à l'énergie d'impact | Examination procedure | 25.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 29.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05006224.9 / EP1555298 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 08.06.2005 | NL | 08.06.2005 | DK | 08.09.2005 | SE | 08.09.2005 | [2006/26] |
Former [2006/22] | BE | 08.06.2005 | |
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | BE | 08.06.2005 | |
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 08.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05214155 ; | [X]DE948191 (BASF AG) [X] 1,11,13,14,16 * page 2, line 6 - page 3, line 11 * * claim 1 * * example 1 *; | [X]DE2500117 (NORMAC) [X] 1,8,11,13 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * claim 1 * * example 2 *; | [A]US5298208 (SIBLEY KENT V [US], et al) [A] 1,3,4,8 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 60 * * claims 1,7 ** column 6, line 28 - column 7, line 26 *; | [X]GB2298424 (KOVACS LASZLO [GB]) [X] 1,3,8 * page 2, line 15 - page 5, line 33 * * claims 1-3,5 * * example 1 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 38, Database accession no. 93-299742, XP002075838 & JPH05214155 A 19930824 (NIPPON POLYURETHANE KOGYO KK) [X] 1,3,6-8 * abstract * |