EP0892539 - Voice messaging system with non-user outcalling and auto-provisioning capabilities [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avaya Technology Corp. 211 Mount Airy Road Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | [2002/02] |
Former [1999/03] | For all designated states Lucent Technologies Inc. 1001 Murphy Ranch Road Milpitas, CA 95035-7912 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ladd, David L. 14568 Horseshoe Court Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | 02 /
Hyde-Thomson, Henry C.A. 11 North Terrace London SW3 2BA, London / GB | 03 /
Reid, Thomas 20187 Via Santa Teresa San Jose, CA 95120 / US | [1999/03] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | Schmidt, Steffen J., Dipl.-Ing. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98111371.5 | 19.06.1998 | [1999/03] | Priority number, date | US19970892644 | 15.07.1997 Original published format: US 892644 | [1999/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0892539 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0892539 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/50, H04M3/42, H04M3/533 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
H04M3/533 (EP,US);
H04M3/54 (EP,US);
H04M7/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/03] | H04M3/50, H04M3/42 | Designated contracting states | [2004/05] |
Former [1999/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sprachnachrichtensystem mit ausgehenden Anrufen von Nichtteilnehmer und mit Selbstlieferungsmöglichkeiten | [1999/03] | English: | Voice messaging system with non-user outcalling and auto-provisioning capabilities | [1999/03] | French: | Système de messagerie vocale avec sélection vers l'extérieur par des non-abonnés et avec des capacités d'autoapprovisionnement | [1999/03] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/32] | 04.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.12.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.12.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.12.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5646982 (HOGAN STEVEN J [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 60 - column 3, line 32 *; | [A]WO9724863 (MCI COMMUNICATIONS CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 17 - page 5, line 4 *; | [A]US5301226 (OLSON PETER D [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0106575 (VMX INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |