EP0889213 - Sensor arrangement and motor control for an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/14] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hemberger, Hans Hubert Neuffenstrasse 20 73274 Notzingen / DE | 02 /
Scherer, Matthias Albblick 12 73730 Esslingen / DE | 03 /
Stiltz, Winfried Grunbacher Strasse 44 71384 Weinstadt / DE | 04 /
Alberter, Günther Nordring 22 90409 Nürnberg / DE | [1999/01] | Application number, filing date | 98111377.2 | 20.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | DE1997128349 | 03.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19728349 | [1999/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0889213 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0889213 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | [2000/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0889213 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F02D11/10, F02D41/28 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
F02D11/10 (EP,US);
F02D41/28 (EP,US);
F02D2009/0294 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0404 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0406 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0414 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/03] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sensoranordnung und Motorsteuerungseinrichtung für einen Verbrennungsmotor | [1999/01] | English: | Sensor arrangement and motor control for an internal combustion engine | [1999/01] | French: | Agencement de capteurs et dispositif de commande de moteur électrique pour moteur à combustion interne | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 08.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]DE4443502 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 17 * * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 2 * * column 4, line 18 - line 21 * * figures 1,3 * [A] 5,6 [Y] 3,4; | [X] - BOSCH, air flow sensor with temperature sensor, Massen Durchflussmesser, STUTTGART, ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, (1995), XP002132294 [X] 1 * page 117, column 2 - page 118, column 3 * | [Y] - LEMME H ET AL, "HALL-SENSOREN IN CMOS - BILLIG UND GENAU", ELEKTRONIK,DE,FRANZIS VERLAG GMBH. MUNCHEN, (19920818), vol. 41, no. 17, ISSN 0013-5658, pages 59 - 62, XP000310956 [Y] 3,4 * page 62, column 1, line 6 - line 21 * |