EP0887463 - Apparatus for dewatering a papermaking felt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.02.2005 [2005/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2000/51] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states Voith Sulzer Papiertechnik Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schiel, Christian Kandinskyweg 8 82418 Murnau / DE | [1999/01] | Application number, filing date | 98111947.2 | 29.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | DE1997127522 | 30.06.1997 Original published format: DE 19727522 | [1999/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0887463 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/53] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0887463 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0887463 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D21F7/12, D21F1/32 | [1999/45] | CPC: |
D21F7/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/01] | D21F7/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, SE [2000/30] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Entwässerung eines Papiermaschinenfilzes | [1999/01] | English: | Apparatus for dewatering a papermaking felt | [1999/01] | French: | Dispositif pour la déshydratation d'un feutre pour papeterie | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 04.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3347740 (GOUMENIOUK GLEB I) [A] 1,14 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 28; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4698134 (GREEN MARSHALL S [US], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figure - * * column 3, line 31 - line 47 *; | [A]GB2055409 (HUYCK CORP) [A] 1 * column A; figure - * * page 1, line 122 - page 2, line 15 * | Examination | US3347740 | US4698134 | GB2055409 |