EP0889473 - Method and apparatus for recovering digital data by employing asynchronous data sampling technique [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daewoo Electronics Corporation 686, Ahyeon-Dong Mapo-Gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states Daewoo Electronics Corporation 686, Ahyeon-Dong Mapo-Gu Seoul / KR | ||
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO., LTD 541, 5-Ga, Namdaemoon-Ro, Jung-Gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choi, Byung-Bong, c/o Video Research Center Daewood Elec. Co., Ltd., 541, 5-Ga, Namdaemoon-Ro Jung-Gu, Seoul / KR | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich R., Dipl.-Phys. SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98111989.4 | 29.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | KR19970029520 | 30.06.1997 Original published format: KR 9729520 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0889473 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0889473 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/14, G11B20/10 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
G11B20/10037 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (KR);
G11B20/10009 (EP,US);
G11B20/1403 (EP,US);
G09G2380/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/14] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Rückgewinnung von digitalen Daten durch Verwendung einer asynchronen Datenabtasttechnik | [1999/01] | English: | Method and apparatus for recovering digital data by employing asynchronous data sampling technique | [1999/01] | French: | Méthode et appareil à récupération de données numériques au moyen de technique d'échantillonnage de données asynchrone | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 31.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/46] | 05.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0777211 (CIRRUS LOGIC INC [US]) [A] 1,2,8 * page 5, line 46 - page 15, line 14; figures B3,B4B,B5,B6 * |