EP0890343 - Medical treatment device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaltenbach & Voigt GmbH & Co. KG Bismarckring 39 88400 Biberach/Riss / DE | [2003/22] |
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states KALTENBACH & VOIGT GmbH & Co. Bismarckring 39 88400 Biberach/Riss / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eibofner, Eugen Vordere Au 13 88400 Bieberach / DE | 02 /
Strohmaier, Ernst Konradstrasse 2 88427 Bad Schussenried / DE | 03 /
Ferraro, Michele Öschweg 3 4565 Recherswil / CH | [1999/02] | Representative(s) | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98112002.5 | 29.06.1998 | [1999/02] | Priority number, date | DE1997129177 | 08.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19729177 | [1999/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0890343 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0890343 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | [1999/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0890343 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61C1/00, A61B17/16 | [1999/12] | CPC: |
A61G15/16 (EP);
A61B17/1626 (EP);
A61C1/0015 (EP);
A61B2017/00199 (EP);
A61B2017/00464 (EP);
A61B2017/00973 (EP);
A61B34/10 (EP);
A61C1/0023 (EP);
A61C1/003 (EP);
A61C1/186 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/02] | A61C1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, LI [1999/49] |
Former [1999/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ärztliche Behandlungsvorrichtung | [1999/02] | English: | Medical treatment device | [1999/02] | French: | Dispositif de traitement médical | [1999/02] | Examination procedure | 23.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/47] | 25.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3144855 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-11,16-20 * page 2, lines 7-18 * * page 3, line 24 - page 4, column 18 ** figure - *; | [YD]JPS6090560 (MORITA MFG) [YD] 21-25 * figure - *; | [XY]US5538423 (COSS RONALD G [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 4, lines 14-38 * * column 8, lines 32-63 * * figure 1 * [Y] 21-25 | by applicant | DE9206022U | EP0588228 | DE19628854 |