EP0892077 - Cast aluminium alloy and components produced thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALUMINUM COMPANY OF AMERICA Alcoa Technical Center, 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center Pennsylvania 15069-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | For all designated states ALUMINUM COMPANY OF AMERICA Alcoa Technical Center, 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, Pennsylvania 15069-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fang, Que-Tsang Alcoa Technical Center, 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, Pennsylvania 15069-0001 / US | 02 /
Lin, Jen C. Alcoa Technical Center, 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, Pennsylvania 15069-0001 / US | 03 /
Sindel, Manfred G. Overweg 24 59494 Soest / DE | 04 /
Jones, Steven A. 6833 West Willis Road Chandler, Arizona 85226 / US | [1999/03] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | Baillie, Iain Cameron Ladas & Parry, Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98112084.3 | 30.06.1998 | [1999/03] | Priority number, date | US19970896385 | 18.07.1997 Original published format: US 896385 | [1999/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0892077 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/06 | [1999/03] | CPC: |
C22C21/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/39] |
Former [1999/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Aluminiumgiesslegierung und daraus hergestellte Komponenten | [1999/03] | English: | Cast aluminium alloy and components produced thereof | [1999/03] | French: | Alliage de fonderie à base d'aluminium et produits fabriqués par cet alliage | [1999/03] | Examination procedure | 19.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/37] | 21.07.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 23.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/13] | 02.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.08.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO9824940 (ALCAN INT LTD [CA], et al) [PX] 1,2,4,5,7-11 * page 9, line 3 - line 17; examples 5,6; claims 1,3,9 *; | [X]US5181969 (KOMATSUBARA TOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,8,11-13 *column 8; example; table 1; alloys 1,2*; | [A]JPS572858 ; | JPS572858 [ ] (MITSUBISHI KEIKINZOKU KOGYO) [ ] * page 3; examples 5,7; table 1 *; | [A]WO9625528 (GIBBS DIE CASTING ALUMINIUM CO [US]) [A] 1,4,7-10 * page 1, line 3 - line 27 * * page 11, line 3 - line 12 * * page 13; examples 2,8 *; | [A]FR2731019 (PECHINEY RHENALU [FR]) [A] 1,3,4,6-10,12,13 * page 1, line 6 - line 15 * * page 2, line 10 - line 34 * * page 5, line 14 - line 27; example 10 *; | [A]JPH01149938 ; | JPH01149938 [ ] (UBE INDUSTRIES) [ ] * page 2; examples 1,8; table . * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820422), vol. 006, no. 063, Database accession no. (C - 099), & JP57002858 A 19820108 (MITSUBISHI KEIKINZOKU KOGYO KK) [A] 1,2,4,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890913), vol. 013, no. 414, Database accession no. (C - 635), & JP01149938 A 19890613 (UBE IND LTD) [A] 1,4,8 * abstract * |