EP0893302 - Extendable loading platform for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.05.2004 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2004 | Refusal of application | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft 80788 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klaus, Wolfgang In Der Lohe 3 85416 Langenbach / DE | [1999/04] | Application number, filing date | 98112120.5 | 01.07.1998 | [1999/04] | Priority number, date | DE1997131324 | 22.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19731324 | [1999/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0893302 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0893302 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | [2002/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60P1/00, B60R5/04, B60P1/02 | [2002/28] | CPC: |
B60P1/003 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/04] | B60P1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/14] |
Former [1999/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ausziehbarer Ladeboden für ein Fahrzeug | [1999/04] | English: | Extendable loading platform for a vehicle | [1999/04] | French: | Plateau de chargement extensible pour un véhicule | [1999/04] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/09] | 25.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/29] | 21.02.2004 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5301992 (WHITMORE HENRY B [US]) [X] 1,2,5-7 * column 2, line 4 - column 3, line 10; figures 1,5,7,9 * * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 1 * * figure 1 * [Y] 3,4,8; | [X]US4799849 (MILLER DONALD L [US]) [X] 1,2,5-7 * column 4, line 9 - line 30 * * column 6, line 13 - line 29 * * figures 2,4,7 *; | [X]US4604022 (BOURGRAF ELROY E [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * figures 9,16; claim 1 *; | [X]US3627158 (KOBASIC FRANK) [X] 1,2,5 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 69; figures 3,6 *; | [Y]US2953287 (JOHN WERNER) [Y] 1-4 * column 2, line 68 - column 3, line 2 * * figures 1,2,3,3A *; | [DY]DE2302972 (MATTES FRIEDRICH) [DY] 1,2 * figure - *; | [DY]US5064335 (BERGERON GHISLAIN J [CA], et al) [DY] 1,2 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 28; figures 1,8 *; | [Y]JPH0781485 ; | [A]US3365084 (FERNICOLA JOHN D) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950731), vol. 1995, no. 06, & JP07081485 A 19950328 (HIROSHI FUKAYA) [Y] 8 * abstract * | by applicant | US5064335 | DE2302972 |