EP0888951 - Sensor installation structure for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.10.2003 [2003/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | ||
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYODA JIDOSHOKKI SEISAKUSHO 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chino, Kenji KK.TOYODA Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Iwanaga, Yoshihisa KK.TOYODA Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98112175.9 | 01.07.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | JP19970177145 | 02.07.1997 Original published format: JP 17714597 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0888951 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0888951 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | [2001/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0888951 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B62D15/02 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
B62D15/023 (EP,US);
B66F9/075 (KR);
B62D7/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/39] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sensoreinbaustrukur für Fahrzeuge | [1999/01] | English: | Sensor installation structure for vehicles | [1999/01] | French: | Structure d'installation d'un capteur pour véhicules | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1998 | Examination requested [1999/01] | 27.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0282967 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1-3,9 * column A; figures 2-4,6,12-14; claims 1,8 * * column 1, line 6 - line 10 * * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 22 * * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 34 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 29 * * column 8, line 7 - line 48 * * column 11, line 53 - column 13, line 56 * [Y] 4-8,13-15; | [XY]US5293002 (GRENET GILLES [FR], et al) [X] 10-12 * column A; figure -; claim - * * column 1, line 9 - line 30 * * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 20 * [Y] 4-7,13-15; | [YA]US5636703 (PAPKE CLARK S [US], et al) [Y] 8 * column A; figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 16 * * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 16 * [A] 1; | [A]EP0423080 (SAME SPA [IT]) [A] 1,8 * column W * | by applicant | JPH0424270 |