EP0890498 - Steering column in a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.10.2001 [2001/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micro Compact Car smart GmbH Industriestrasse 8 71272 Renningen / DE | [1999/48] |
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states Micro Compact Car AG Mattenstrasse 149 2500 Biel 4 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Thomas In den Lunkteilen 15 75365 Calw / DE | 02 /
Ganser, Martin Schulstrasse 7 71263 Weil der Stadt / DE | 03 /
Schick, Ulrich Schwarzwaldstrasse 15 72202 Nagold-Vollmaringen / DE | [1999/02] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Klaus, et al DaimlerChrysler AG Intellectual Property Management FTP - C 106 70546 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | Weiss, Klaus, et al DaimlerChrysler AG, Intellectual Property Management, FTP - C 106 70546 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1999/03] | Weiss, Klaus, et al c/o Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft, FTP/S C 106 70546 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 98112272.4 | 02.07.1998 | [1999/02] | Priority number, date | DE1997129893 | 12.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19729893 | [1999/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0890498 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0890498 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/16, B60R21/05 | [1999/02] | CPC: |
B62D1/195 (EP,US);
B62D1/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, IT [2000/25] |
Former [1999/38] | DE, ES, FR, IT | ||
Former [1999/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Lenksäule in einem Kraftfahrzeug | [1999/02] | English: | Steering column in a motor vehicle | [1999/02] | French: | Colonne de direction dans un véhicule à moteur | [1999/02] | Examination procedure | 20.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 30.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB2084522 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1 * page 3, line 9 - line 25; figures 3,5 * [A] 9; | [X]US5067747 (YOKOYAMA HIDEKI [JP]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 28; figures 2,4,5 *; | [A]US4411331 (HANADA HIDEKAZU [JP]) [A] 3,4 * figure - * |