EP0891046 - A receiving apparatus with intermittent receiving [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP | ||
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Masayuki 688-10, Niiharu-cho Midori-ku, Yokohama 226-0017 / JP | 02 /
Sato, Yukio 830-1, Tokaichiba-cho Midori-ku, Yokohama 226-0025 / JP | [1999/02] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/02] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98112492.8 | 06.07.1998 | [1999/02] | Priority number, date | JP19970180865 | 07.07.1997 Original published format: JP 18086597 | [1999/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0891046 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0891046 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | [2003/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0891046 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/16 | [1999/02] | CPC: |
H04W52/0216 (EP,US);
H04B1/1615 (EP,US);
H04W52/029 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/06] |
Former [1999/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Empfänger mit intermittierendem Empfang | [1999/02] | English: | A receiving apparatus with intermittent receiving | [1999/02] | French: | Récepteur avec réception intermittante | [1999/02] | Examination procedure | 06.07.1998 | Examination requested [1999/02] | 28.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9415409 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]WO9603811 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * |