EP0895278 - Patterning process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2001/13] |
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Engelhardt, Manfred, Dr. Edelweissstrasse 1a 83620 Feldkirchen-Westerham / DE | 02 /
Weinrich, Volker, Dr. Sachranger Strasse 29/I 81549 München / DE | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 33 09 20 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98112890.3 | 10.07.1998 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | DE1997133345 | 01.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19733345 | [1999/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0895278 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0895278 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/033, H01L21/311, H01L21/3213 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
H01L21/31144 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/32139 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/05] | H01L21/033 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2001/19] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Strukturierungsverfahren | [1999/05] | English: | Patterning process | [1999/05] | French: | Procédé de structuration | [1999/05] | Examination procedure | 30.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/39] | 14.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/31] | 10.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4244799 (FRASER DAVID B, et al) [X] 1,6-8,11,12,14 * column 3, line 49 - column 7, line 26; figure - * [A] 13; | [A]US5254217 (MANIAR PAPU [US], et al) [A] 1-6,8,9,11,14 * column 4, line 56 - column 6, line 38 *; | [X]US5403438 (MOTOYAMA TAKUSHI [JP]) [X] 1,7-9,11,12,14 * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 24; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0786805 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6,8,9,11,14 * column 3, line 7 - column 6, line 48 *; | [E]US5883011 (LIN XI-WEI [US], et al) [E] 1,7,8,11,12,14* column 3, line 23 - column 5, line 21 * |