EP0898320 - Current collector for molten carbonate fuel cell and process of manufacturing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/14] |
Former [1999/08] | For all designated states DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nitschke, Felix, Dr. Thalkirchnerstrasse 278 81371 München / DE | 02 /
Wind, Jörg, Dr. Gartenstrasse 28 85757 Karlsfeld / DE | [1999/08] | Application number, filing date | 98113258.2 | 16.07.1998 | [1999/08] | Priority number, date | DE1997135854 | 19.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19735854 | [1999/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0898320 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0898320 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02 | [1999/08] | CPC: |
H01M8/0206 (EP,US);
H01M2008/147 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0051 (EP,US);
H01M8/021 (EP,US);
H01M8/0228 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [2004/45] |
Former [1999/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Stromkollektor für eine Brennstoffzelle mit geschmolzenen Karbonaten und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1999/08] | English: | Current collector for molten carbonate fuel cell and process of manufacturing | [1999/08] | French: | Collecteur de courant pour pile à combustible à carbonates fondus et procédé de fabrication | [1999/08] | Examination procedure | 19.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/16] | 17.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/18] | 16.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4389467 (SINGH RAJ N, et al) [X] 1,9 * column 4, lines 16-20 *; | [X]DE4410711 (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JUELICH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,9,11 * claims 1,7 * * column 3, lines 44-50 *; | [A]EP0703301 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [A] 6-8 * abstract *; | [A]DE19541187 (MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]DE19532791 (MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 10 * claims 1,3,5 * |