EP0916740 - Vacuummetallurgical Vessel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTOCAST AG Feuerfest-Produkte und Giesshilfsmittel Kaiserswerther Strasse 86-88 40882 Ratingen / DE | [1999/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwan, Markus Alte Landstrasse 30 41844 Wegberg / DE | 02 /
Normann, Matthias Am Sägewerk 19 40885 Ratingen / DE | 03 /
Schulte, Hartmut Jägerstrasse 25 57072 Mudersbach / DE | [1999/20] | Representative(s) | Palgen, Peter, et al Palgen, Schumacher & Kolllegen Frühlingstrasse 46A 45133 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Palgen, Peter, et al Palgen, Schumacher & Kolllegen Frühlingstrasse 46A 45133 Essen / DE | ||
Former [1999/20] | Palgen, Peter, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Patentanwälte Palgen, Schumacher & Kluin, Mulvanystrasse 2 40239 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 98113451.3 | 18.07.1998 | [1999/20] | Priority number, date | DE1997149829 | 11.11.1997 Original published format: DE 19749829 | [1999/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0916740 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C21C7/10 | [1999/20] | CPC: |
B22D41/00 (EP);
C21C7/0075 (EP);
C21C7/10 (EP);
F27D1/1808 (EP);
F27D2099/0093 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/04] |
Former [1999/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vakuummetallurgisches Gefäss | [1999/20] | English: | Vacuummetallurgical Vessel | [1999/20] | French: | Recipient pour la métallurgie sous vide | [1999/20] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/20] | 14.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/01] | 29.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB970546 (BOCHUMER VEREIN) [Y] 1-10 * figure -; claim - *; | [Y]DE1948440 (HOESCH AG) [Y] 1-10 * figure -; claim - *; | [Y]DE3609783 (DOERRENBERG EDELSTAHL GMBH) [Y] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE1433413 (FRIED. KRUPP AG) |