EP0895362 - Electrical circuit for the detection of the state of a switching arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leopold Kostal GmbH & Co. KG Wiesenstrasse 47 58507 Lüdenscheid / DE | [1999/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lampe, Wolfgang Uhlandstrasse 21 58809 Neuenrade / DE | [1999/05] | Application number, filing date | 98113674.0 | 22.07.1998 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | DE1997132283 | 26.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19732283 | [2004/10] |
Former [1999/05] | DE1997132283 | 28.07.1997 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0895362 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0895362 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H03M11/24 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
H03M11/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/41] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrische Schaltungsanordnung zur Erfassung eines Schaltzustands | [1999/05] | English: | Electrical circuit for the detection of the state of a switching arrangement | [1999/05] | French: | Circuit électrique pour la détection de l'état d'un dispositif de commutation | [1999/05] | Examination procedure | 13.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/23] | 30.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 18.11.2004 | [2005/10] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS60194697 ; | [X]FR2653279 (JAEGER [FR]) [X] 1,7 * figures 4,5 *; | [A]US4471234 (HORIUCHI TATSUMI [JP]) [A] 4 * the whole document *; | [A]US4234872 (HALDER MATHIS) [A] 4 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860215), vol. 010, no. 039, Database accession no. (E - 381), & JP60194697 A 19851003 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 1,2,7 * abstract * |