EP0887760 - Method and apparatus for decoding bar code symbols [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/01] | Method and apparatus for decoding bar code symbols using subpixel interpolation | ||
[2002/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNITED PARCEL SERVICE OF AMERICA, INC. 55 Glenlake Parkway, N.E. Atlanta, GA 30328 / US | [2003/14] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states UNITED PARCEL SERVICE OF AMERICA, INC. 400 Perimeter Center, Terraces North Atlanta, GA 30346 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klancnik, Mihael Dubja Vas 98 Rajve Na Koroskem 62390 / SL | 02 /
Figarella, Luis 27 Todd Road Nashua, NH 03060 / US | [1999/15] |
Former [1999/01] | 01 /
Klancnik, Mihael 15 Hawthorne Cove Road Brookfield, CT 06804 / US | ||
02 /
Figarella, Luis 66 Madera Drive Waterbury, CT 06704 / US | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98113801.9 | 19.07.1993 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | US19920927905 | 10.08.1992 Original published format: US 927905 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0887760 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/53] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0887760 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | [2001/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0887760 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP0887760 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/14, G06K7/10 | [2001/06] | CPC: |
G06K7/1092 (EP,US);
G06K7/1093 (EP,US);
G06K7/1443 (EP,US);
G06K7/1456 (EP,US);
G06K7/1465 (EP,US);
G06K7/1469 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/01] | G06K7/10, G06K7/14 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE [2003/06] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Dekodieren von strichkodierten Symbolen | [2002/30] | English: | Method and apparatus for decoding bar code symbols | [2002/30] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour décoder des codes à barres | [2002/30] |
Former [1999/01] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Dekodieren von strichkodierten Symbolen mit Unterpixel-Interpolation | ||
Former [1999/01] | Method and apparatus for decoding bar code symbols using subpixel interpolation | ||
Former [1999/01] | Méthode et appareil pour décoder des codes à barres en utilisant l'interpolation de sous-pixels | Examination procedure | 07.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/32] | 08.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93111535.6 / EP0591635 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0353842 (IMAGE BUSINESS SYSTEMS CORP [US]) [A] 1,8* abstract *; | [A]US4963719 (BROOKS MICHAEL T [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * column 1, line 6 - column 3, line 28 * |