EP0879863 - Pressure sensitive adhesive composition and tape employing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/48] | Pressure sensitive adhesive and tape employing a multi-arm elastomeric block copolymer | ||
[2005/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/41] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [1998/48] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jingjing, Ma Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Nestegard, Mark K. Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2005/36] |
Former [1998/48] | 01 /
Jingjing, Ma c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufac. Co. 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
02 /
Nestegard, Mark K. c/o Minnesota Mining and M. Co. 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/48] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98113826.6 | 24.05.1994 | [1998/48] | Priority number, date | US19930066860 | 25.05.1993 Original published format: US 66860 | [1998/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0879863 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0879863 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09J153/02, C09J7/02, C08F297/04, C08G81/02 | [1998/48] | CPC: |
C09J153/02 (EP,US);
C08F297/04 (EP,US);
C08F297/044 (EP,US);
C08G81/022 (EP,US);
C09J7/10 (EP,US);
C09J7/26 (EP,US);
C09J7/381 (EP,US);
C09J7/387 (EP,US);
C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L2666/28 (EP,US);
C08L53/02 (EP,US);
C09J2400/283 (EP,US);
C09J2453/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31797 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31895 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31899 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09J153/02, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C09J153/02, C08L2666/02, C08L2666/28 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1998/48] | Title | German: | Haftklebstoffzusammensetzung und Klebeband, das diese verwendet | [2005/40] | English: | Pressure sensitive adhesive composition and tape employing the same | [2005/40] | French: | Composition d'adhésif sensible à la pression et ruban adhésive utilisant ladite composition | [2005/40] |
Former [1998/48] | Druckempfindlicher Klebstoff und Klebeband mit einem mehrarmigen Blockcopolymer | ||
Former [1998/48] | Pressure sensitive adhesive and tape employing a multi-arm elastomeric block copolymer | ||
Former [1998/48] | Adhésif sensible à la pression et ruban adhésive comprenant un polymère bloc à plusieurs branches | Examination procedure | 14.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/23] | 27.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94107983.2 / EP0632073 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4092375 (VREUGDENHIL ARIE D) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 14 - line 24; claim - *; | [DY]US4556464 (ST CLAIR DAVID J [US]) [DY] 1-11 * column 2, line 14 - line 18; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0471998 (ENICHEM ELASTOMERS [IT]) [A] 1-11* example 4; claim 4 *; | [Y]US5183705 (BIRKHOLZ RONALD B [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * column 3, line 35 - line 36; claim - * |