EP0903672 - Cellular automaton and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2001/22] |
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber, Werner Franz-Marc-Strasse 6/3 80637 München / DE | 02 /
Jung, Stefan Westermühlstrasse 1a 80469 München / DE | 03 /
Thewes, Roland Jägerheimstrasse 7 82194 Gröbenzell / DE | 04 /
Luck, Adreas Weidener Strasse 19 81737 München / DE | [1999/12] | Application number, filing date | 98114026.2 | 27.07.1998 | [1999/12] | Priority number, date | DE1997141209 | 19.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19741209 | [1999/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0903672 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0903672 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | [2001/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/80 | [1999/12] | CPC: |
G06N3/063 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2002/33] |
Former [1999/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zellularer Automat und dessen Verwendung | [1999/12] | English: | Cellular automaton and its use | [1999/12] | French: | Automate cellulaire et son usage | [1999/12] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/12] | 24.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.07.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.07.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5140670 (CHUA LEON O ET AL) [Y] 3 * column 19, line 30 - column 22, line 29; figure 9 *; | [A]EP0739040 (OHMI TADAHIRO ;SHIBATA TADASHI (JP)) [A] 1 * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 13; figures 16-21 *; | [XY] - MAEZAWA K ET AL, "Functions and applications of monostable-bistable transition logic elements (MOBILE's) having multiple-input terminals", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, FEB. 1994, USA, vol. 41, no. 2, ISSN 0018-9383, pages 148 - 154, XP002179182 [X] 1 * page 148, column L, line 1 - page 153, column R, line 5; figures 1-14 * [Y] 2,3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/16.277386 | [Y] - TAHERI B A, "CMOS IMPLEMENTATION AND FABRICATION OF THE PSEUDO ANALOG NEURON", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MULTIPLE VALUED LOGIC. SACRAMENTO, MAY 24 - 27, 1993, LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, (19930524), vol. SYMP. 23, ISBN 0-8186-3350-6, pages 266 - 270, XP000400346 [Y] 2 * page 268, column L, line 6 - line 26; figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISMVL.1993.289549 | [A] - TADASHI SHIBATA ET AL, "A FUNCTIONAL MOS TRANSISTOR FEATURING GATE-LEVEL WEIGHTED SUM AND THRESHOLD OPERATIONS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19920601), vol. 39, no. 6, ISSN 0018-9383, pages 1444 - 1455, XP000271791 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/16.137325 |