EP0894982 - Hydraulic servo device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogata, Hiroshi 1-12-20-104 Hirado, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Kimura, Katsumi 24-2 Ohzenji, Asao-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Sugiyama, Kazuhiko 1-11-1-103 Inari Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Hattori, Kazuo 2-7-1-709 Kaneya Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/05] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98114115.3 | 28.07.1998 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | JP19970218003 | 29.07.1997 Original published format: JP 21800397 | [1999/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0894982 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0894982 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | [2000/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0894982 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F15B9/10, F15B21/04, F15B11/12 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
F15B21/044 (EP);
F15B11/121 (EP);
F15B9/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/05] | F15B9/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2001/05] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hydraulische Servoeinrichtung | [1999/05] | English: | Hydraulic servo device | [1999/05] | French: | Dispositif asservi hydraulique | [1999/05] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 17.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60256603 ; | [A]GB693504 (BOULTON AIRCRAFT LTD, et al) [A] 3,11 * page 2, lines 22-28; figure - *; | [A]US2874542 (TEAR JAMES D) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US2926635 (LEONARD WILLIAM F, et al) [A] 7,15 * column 4, lines 21-39; figure - *; | [A]US3757640 (KAROL J) [A] 3,7,11,15 * abstract *; | [X]US4245547 (REYNOLDS RONALD W) [X] 1,2,17 * column 2, lines 42-56; figure - *; | [A]EP0088017 (PARISIENNE OUTILLAGE [FR]) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [A]US5207741 (ABE MINORU [JP]) [A] 11,15 * column 3, lines 14-35; figure - *; | [A]EP0767310 (EUROCOPTER DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 18; figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860514), vol. 010, no. 130, Database accession no. (M - 478), & JP60256603 A 19851218 (YUKIO WATANABE) [A] 1,7,15 * abstract * |