EP0896799 - Underwear for women [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2000 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2000 [2000/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BUCHNER, Fritz Rastatter Strasse 83 68239 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/07] | For all designated states Buchner, Fritz Rastatter Strasse 83 68239 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/07] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Wolf-Dieter Reble & Klose Postfach 12 15 19 68066 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/07] | Fischer, Wolf-Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Postfach 12 15 19 68066 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 98114134.4 | 29.07.1998 | [1999/07] | Priority number, date | DE1997214213U | 11.08.1997 Original published format: DE 29714213 U | [1999/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0896799 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0896799 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | [1999/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A41B9/04, A41D27/20 | [1999/07] | CPC: |
A41B9/007 (EP);
A41B9/04 (EP);
A41D27/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT [2000/03] |
Former [1999/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Damenunterhose | [1999/07] | English: | Underwear for women | [1999/07] | French: | Slip pour dames | [1999/07] | Examination procedure | 09.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/31] | 13.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE8809986U (DIETER LEHR) [DA] 1 * claims 1-6 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE29504993U (HORST FIEDLER) [A] 2 * claims 2-4,6 * * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0240958 (TRIUMPH INTERNATIONAL AG) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 42 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0101142 (WACOAL CORP) [A] 1 * page 5, line 14 - page 6, line 10 * * figure 1 *; | [A]FR2657501 (DOMINIQUE PIERETTE FERRIER); | [A]US3871030 (RALPH W. GREEN) |